Accounts and annual returns TREAT ME KIND INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1178917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2024 18 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2023 10 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 10 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 15 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 15 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 08 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 09 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window