WHALEY BRIDGE ROSE QUEEN FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides an annual Carnival Day for the local community and raises funds for local children's and youth groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 June 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Mourne | Chair | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Andrew Stout | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Brown | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jayne Brown | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hal Debes | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Smith | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Frankland | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUCY AINSWORTH | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Stones | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen Fox | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Smith | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £499 | £4 | £11 | £8.07k | £7.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303 | £143 | £320 | £5.45k | £9.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 2 APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE HIGH PEAK OF DERBYSHIRE PARTICULARLY THE YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
THE HIGH PEAK OF DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 Jodrell Road
Whaley Bridge
HIGH PEAK
Derbyshire
SK23 7AR
- Phone:
- 07736 044379
- Email:
- ainsworth181@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window