SOAP FOR HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to relieve poverty through the collection and distribution of toiletries to benefit those who are experiencing difficult personal circumstances. With donations received, we will support Women's refuges in London, with an aim to expand our scope to other causes such as the Homeless, within and outside of London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAISY VICTORIA HUNTER-WOOLLEY | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON LUDGATE | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FISHER | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE IN NEED AND THOSE EXPERIENCING HOMELESSNESS BY THE PROVISION TOILETRIES AND SUCH OTHER HYGIENE PRODUCTS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BROOMCROFT CLOSE
WOKING
GU22 8NR
- Phone:
- 07815605211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window