Accounts and annual returns THE LUNAR PROJECT

Charity number: 1176570
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 June 2022 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 June 2022 510 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days