THE HISTORICAL DANCE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote historical dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 June 2018: CIO registration
- 17 September 2020: Funds received from 270896 THE HISTORICAL DANCE SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Spicer | Chair | 29 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Cavet | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Young | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
TALITHA MACKENZIE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RICHARD COLLINS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID SMITHIES | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE DAYE | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.58k | £17.69k | £8.02k | £37.12k | £25.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.81k | £20.73k | £10.75k | £17.71k | £25.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jun 2018 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY, PRACTICE, EDUCATION, AND PUBLIC ENGAGEMENT IN THE PERFORMANCE, MUSIC, AND COSTUME OF EUROPEAN AND OTHER DANCES FROM THE 15TH TO 20TH CENTURIES AS RECORDED IN THE SOURCES OF THE PERIOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sawter House Farm
Mill Bank Road
Mill Bank
Sowerby Bridge
HX6 3DY
- Phone:
- 07479387665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window