FRIENDS OF SAINT MARY’S CHURCH COMBERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities assisting in education and appreciation of ecclesiastical architecture to support the fabric & surroundings of St. Mary?s Church. Raising funds through educational and cultural events, from individuals, corporate donors and by pursuing grants with a view to supporting its Parochial Church Council's projects concerning repair & enhancement of this Grade I Listed Building and surroundings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 09 January 2018: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF SAINT MARY’S CHURCH (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Royce | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRIAN JOHN MCCABE | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
GODFREY CURTIS | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID HUGHES | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN CRANG | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.55k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.84k | £15.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.13k | £4.12k | £4.12k | £262 | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
ACTIVITIES AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC ASSISTING IN THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF ECCLESIASTICAL ARCHITECTURE TO SUPPORT THE FABRIC AND SURROUNDINGS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH COMBERTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 SWAYNES LANE
COMBERTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7EF
- Phone:
- 01223263355
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window