MEOPHAM U3A

Charity number: 1177639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Meopham U3A provides education and training for people no longer in full time employment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £6,239
Total expenditure: £6,528

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 March 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL CHANTRY Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £8.80k £2.23k £3.88k £6.25k £6.24k
Total expenditure £4.91k £4.12k £5.16k £9.07k £6.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 02 May 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 April 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Belvoir
Main Road
Longfield Hill
LONGFIELD
Kent
DA3 7AS
Phone:
07969931108