HYLTON CASTLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hylton Castle Trust manages Hylton Castle and dene on the local community's behalf. Hylton Castle, currently undergoing refurbishment, will be opening as a community-led heritage centre in the summer of 2019. Hylton Castle Trust will be working with partners to provide work placements and training opportunities for local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £307,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sunderland
Governance
- 05 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Hearn | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Liddle | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Doris Macknight | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COLIN WILSON | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Cllr Denis Wilson | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rajinder Singh JP | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|||||
GEORGE KEITH MACKNIGHT | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
JACQUELINE SMITH | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ORD | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £80.10k | £269.16k | £393.46k | £448.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.91k | £69.36k | £261.48k | £359.34k | £447.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £80.10k | £255.10k | £255.10k | £307.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF CITY OF SUNDERLAND AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS (INHABITANTS): 1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND CULTURAL HERITAGE AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF HYLTON CASTLE, SUNDERLAND IN PARTICULAR BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A HERITAGE CENTRE. 2 TO CONSERVE, PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HISTORIC BUILDINGS AND GARDEN STRUCTURES AND RECORDS RELATING TO HYLTON CASTLE. 3 TO CONSERVE, PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE SURROUNDING NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING HYLTON DENE AND HYLTON DENE LOCAL NATURE RESERVE INCLUDING BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY AND CONSERVING WILDLIFE. 4 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INHABITANTS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winchester House
Baxter Road
Town End Farm
SUNDERLAND
SR5 4LW
- Phone:
- 01915618611
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window