Accounts and annual returns ST. THOMAS MORE’S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1179155
Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required