DMI COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community centre providing rooms for hire by groups and individuals within the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,629 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 19 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shane Hollingdrake | Chair | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine MacDonald | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Lister | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Young | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Young | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE SHERRIFF | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARETH JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.59k | £56.51k | £64.02k | £39.20k | £84.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.64k | £38.46k | £84.49k | £42.47k | £72.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.63k | £15.76k | £1.25k | £44.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 19 JAN 2018 AMENDED ON 06 JAN 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DENHOLME AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE RESIDENTS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE SOCIAL WELFARE, EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS. THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DMI COMMUNITY CENTRE
MAIN ROAD
DENHOLME
BRADFORD
BD13 4BL
- Phone:
- 01274 833086
- Email:
- dmicentre@mail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window