Financial history THE REDEEMED EVANGELICAL MISSION (TREM) DAGENHAM

Charity number: 1177519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.79k £91.79k £79.23k £90.34k £128.38k
Total expenditure £70.11k £54.89k £60.11k £81.61k £101.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A