MOLLY ROSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MRF's principal objectives are: To promote and protect the mental health of young people through the provision of support, education and practical advice To provide support to families and friends of young people suffering from mental illness, including those bereaved after a suicide To advance the awareness and education of the general public in all areas relating to mental illness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ALEXANDER RUSSELL | Chair | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marina Jane Dunford | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Kay Russell | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Wright | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Gillian Peterman | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANN RUSSELL | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RICHARD EVENS | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.52k | £24.13k | £35.23k | £42.84k | £93.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.02k | £2.59k | £3.29k | £18.14k | £41.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25, IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM DEPRESSION OR OTHER MENTAL ILLNESS THAT PUTS THEM AT RISK OF SUICIDE BY PROVIDING THEM, THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS, PEER GROUPS AND SUPPORT NETWORKS WITH INFORMATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT SUITABLE FOR BOTH THEIR AGE AND ILLNESS. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO BY: 1. MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO OTHER CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH SUICIDE, MENTAL ILLNESS OR MENTAL HEALTH EDUCATION 2. PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THE MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 3. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND PEER GROUPS OF YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS 4. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO BEREAVED FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND PEER GROUPS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AFTER A SUICIDE 5. ADVANCING THE AWARENESS AND EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL ILLNESS FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Delta House
Phoenix Business Centre
Rosslyn Crescent
Harrow
HA1 2SP
- Phone:
- 02087280138
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window