Financial history WINNERSH PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1177744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.87k £16.66k £17.65k £18.02k £21.99k
Total expenditure £20.31k £2.08k £1.16k £341 £25.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A