Accounts and annual returns SUPER NATURED

Charity number: 1179748
Charity reporting is overdue by 1354 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Annual return 24 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 624 days
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 624 days
Annual return 24 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 989 days
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 989 days
Annual return 24 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1354 days
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1354 days
Annual return 24 October 2019 03 May 2021 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 October 2019 03 May 2021 252 days late Download Open in new window