Trustees BRANSTON LITTLE PICKLES PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1176959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Molly Lound Chair 15 May 2024
None on record
Kira Taylor Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Michelle Margrett Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Mann Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Sarah Reeves Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
ALISON PARSONS Trustee 03 January 2020
None on record