HAWKESBURY HOSPITAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hawkesbury Upton Village Hall is an excellent, well equipped, versatile venue which is used extensively by local organisations for a wide variety of activities. It is also available for private hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,260 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Charles Webb | Chair | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Strange | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Kempster | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Griffin | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charene Louise Winbow | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wayne Charlesworth | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Rispin | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Hope | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Roberts | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sandy | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOSEPH CULLEN | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA STEEDS | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA CLARKE | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL FOZARD | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ROGERS | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANGELO SAURO | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE STANBRIDGE | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.54k | £54.77k | £38.35k | £73.76k | £46.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.35k | £91.15k | £20.89k | £70.15k | £28.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | £12.50k | £17.15k | £25.63k | £1.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HAWKESBURY ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hawkesbury Upton Village Hall
High Street
Hawkesbury Upton
BADMINTON
Avon
GL9 1AU
- Phone:
- 07973680297
- Email:
- info@village-hall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window