Financial history THE PHOENIX GROUP FOR DEAF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS

Charity number: 1180870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £182.00k £157.53k £183.15k £198.57k £274.18k
Total expenditure £225.00k £147.29k £134.71k £163.78k £186.66k
Income from government contracts £9.01k £6.09k £3.19k £13.06k £32.94k
Income from government grants £680 N/A £9.38k £22.56k £2.50k