Financial history BINGLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1180077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £120.60k £127.70k £781.29k £132.93k £1.95m
Total expenditure £47.45k £44.17k £122.04k £111.48k £66.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.81m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £655.31k N/A £1.81m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £115.42k N/A £119.39k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £8.70k N/A £16.37k
Income - Other N/A N/A £1.86k N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £10.60k N/A £45.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £111.45k N/A £19.17k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.36k N/A £13.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £11.15k N/A £7.66k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £1.21k