Trustees BINGLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION CIO
Charity number: 1180077

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER FREDERICK QUINN | Chair | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Henry Brown | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John William Proctor | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Kennedy | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Brent Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Conderson | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PAUL FREAR | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.