SENTINEL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) The advancement of education in Pakistan by establishing schools in undeveloped areas and providing grants of financial assistance to economically disadvantaged students to assist with payment of school/college fees. b) The relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health in Pakistan by establishing medical care centres in undeveloped areas and supporting existing med
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 21 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Choudhry Muhammad Tufail Zafar | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHAUDHRY MUHAMMAD ZAHID IQBAL | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD SHAHID IQBAL CHAUDHRY | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 737 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 737 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 May 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 May 2022 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PAKISTAN BY ESTABLISHING SCHOOLS IN UNDEVELOPED AREAS AND PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED STUDENTS TO ASSIST WITH PAYMENT OF SCHOOL/COLLEGE FEES. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PAKISTAN BY ESTABLISHING MEDICAL CARE CENTRES IN UNDEVELOPED AREAS AND SUPPORTING EXISTING MEDICAL CARE CENTRES. 3) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN PAKISTAN.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sentinel House, Unit 36
Oakwood Hill Industrial Estate
Oakwood Hill
Loughton
Essex
IG10 3TZ
- Phone:
- 02085146565
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window