Oatlands Community Centre Charitable Incorporated Organisation (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oatlands Community Centre is a voluntary, not-for-profit organisation and a registered charity (No 1177578) situated on Mount Street, Harrogate. Our main aim is to provide non regulated services and activites for families, young people and the elderly across our community by providing community space available for hire to host a wide range of community and private events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,960 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- OATLANDS PRE SCHOOL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (CIO) (Previous name)
- OATLANDS PRE-SCHOOL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Lindsey Temple | Chair | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Watson | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Smith-Dunn | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.83k | £112.39k | £60.96k | £25.17k | £78.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.95k | £94.90k | £122.82k | £11.77k | £24.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.12k | £800 | £1.00k | £2.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Mar 2018 as amended on 31 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1) THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; B) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; C) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; D) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; E) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO 2) TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A COMMUNITY HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HARROGATE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE, OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oatlands Pre School
Mount Street
Harrogate
HG2 8DQ
- Phone:
- 01423871846
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window