THE CHARLES LAMB SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds meetings and publishes research in the Charles Lamb Bulletin. Makes available to the public (at Guildhall Library in the City of London and the Guildhall Art Gallery) a collection of books, manuscripts and other material related to Lamb and his circle. Makes grants to universities and other bodies for bursaries for students attending conferences relating to Lamb's works and period.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr FELICITY RUTH JAMES | Chair | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edward John Patrick Weech | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Barton Neikirk | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susan Oliver | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Veronica Strachan | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Stephens | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Strachan | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Gardner | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Mary Goodman | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MICHAEL HEALEY | Trustee | 08 May 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.12k | £5.81k | £6.32k | £12.35k | £6.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.88k | £8.13k | £9.29k | £9.20k | £8.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE STUDY OF THE LIFE, WORKS AND TIMES OF CHARLES LAMB AND HIS CIRCLE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY. IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF THE CHARITY MAY MAKE ARRANGEMENTS FOR: 1. PRESERVING AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC FOR STUDY BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, PICTURES, AND OTHER MATERIAL RELATING TO THIS FIELD; 2. PUBLISHING A BULLETIN AND ORGANISING AND COOPERATING IN THE ORGANISATION OF MEETINGS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC ON RELEVANT TOPICS; AND 3. CONSULTING OR SPONSORING RESEARCH INTO RELEVANT FIELDS OF LITERATURE AND RELATED STUDIES, ASSISTING IN THE PUBLICATION OF SUCH STUDIES, AND AWARDING PRIZES ETC. AS APPROPRIATE, FOR WORK IN THESE FIELDS AND IN THE PURSUIT OF SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAIN HOUSE
Bath Spa University
CORSHAM
SN13 0BZ
- Phone:
- 01225875642
- Email:
- charleslambsociety@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window