Financial history LONDON INTERNATIONAL CHORAL CONDUCTING COMPETITION

Charity Number: 1177794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.89k £0 £0 £2 £4
Total expenditure £9.25k £63 £88 £78 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A