GERTIE'S LONELY GUINEA PIG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer Rescue space for neglected and unwanted Guinea pigs - Re-home Guinea Pigs. Offer advice and support to Guinea Pig owners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 01 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Jackson | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Price | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KAREN CORDER | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE MUIR | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.95k | £17.29k | £15.32k | £13.27k | £23.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.33k | £16.76k | £13.80k | £15.01k | £18.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 January 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 07 January 2024 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF GUINEA PIGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH GUINEA PIGS; 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS GUINEA PIGS BRED OR OWNED AS PETS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR THOSE WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE CARE OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 FERN AVENUE
NORTH SHIELDS
NE29 0RJ
- Phone:
- 07917182017
- Email:
- gertiesrescue@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window