THE FOUNDATION FOR FORGIVENESS AND RECONCILIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation for Forgiveness and Reconciliation exists to prevent violence and transform conflict by promoting values of peace and reconciliation through workshops and film in the UK and Lebanon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Lebanon
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 18 February 2019: CIO registration
- FFR (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WALTER SERGIO NICORA | Chair | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lidia Ethel Lammardo | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Keith Miller Lockhart | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.76k | £234.19k | £118.08k | £250.08k | £220.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.82k | £136.56k | £116.66k | £289.88k | £275.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2019 as amended on 26 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION, RELIEVE THE SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS ARISING THROUGH CONFLICT AND MAINTAIN SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES BY IDENTIFYING THE ISSUES OF CONFLICT AND SEEKING TO RESOLVE SUCH CONFLICT, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PROMOTING CHRISTIAN VALUES OF PEACE AND RECONCILIATION, BY: -BRIDGE BUILDING EVENTS, WORKSHOPS AND ASSOCIATED RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES -IMPLEMENTING SOCIAL ACTION PROGRAMMES -PROVIDING EMERGENCY HUMANITARIAN RELIEF - CREATING FILMS THAT PROMOTE VALUES OF PEACE AND RECONCILIATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 Hunts Pond Road
Park Gate
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 6RB
- Phone:
- 07835695661
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window