THE CHRIS BEVINGTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund projects that use music to improve the lives of children and young people living with or facing challenging circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY FELWICK | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FELWICK | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HUNT | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUCINDA PULLINGER | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAM HADDAD | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2019 | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.82k | £10.82k | £3.43k | £114 | £7.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £22.00k | £685 | £139 | £162 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 11 May 2025 | 436 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 11 May 2025 | 436 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 02 July 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 02 July 2023 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 303 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (B) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING; AND (D) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS 'YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: RACE; GENDER; RELIGION; ETHNIC ORIGIN; IMMIGRATION HISTORY; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; DISABILITY; OR WHO ARE WITHIN, OR HAVE EXPERIENCED, THE PUBLIC CARE OR PENAL SYSTEM').
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYSTACKS
THE HAMLET
GALLOWSTREE COMMON
READING
RG4 9BU
- Phone:
- 02072962000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window