Accounts and annual returns SOCIETY OF BROWNFIELD RISK ASSESSMENT

Charity number: 1180875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 17 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 15 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window