Trustees SOCIETY OF BROWNFIELD RISK ASSESSMENT
Charity number: 1180875

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Baker | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bannon | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Lyons | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Gibson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Townley | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Rolfe | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melinda Evans | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Wilding | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr RACHEL DEWHURST | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.