THE ARK INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ark International provides services that support people in need, such as: vulnerable adults, young people, families, people with drug/alcohol addiction, mental health, and modern-day slavery. The head office is in Bolton, and we also have another base in London, Uxbridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £4,500 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £39.97k | £18.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £39.28k | £13.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.35k | £4.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER WITH THE FOCUS ON THE AREAS WITHIN BOLTON AND SALFORD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. TO EXPRESS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF CHRISTIAN FAITH MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window