GO MAD UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work in rural communities in the Dominican Republic to create opportunities for everyone to stay in education (eg provide transport to secondary school), gain job skills, learn English, have access to healthcare and learn more of God's love for them. We also provide funding to Nazareth House children's home to provide care staff and education for the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dominican Republic
Governance
- 03 July 2018: CIO registration
- RESTORING HOPE UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS A ROBINSON | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE HODGSON | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHURCHILL | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.75k | £36.51k | £34.91k | £19.66k | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.75k | £36.31k | £38.50k | £22.98k | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 03 JUL 2018 AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE GO MAD UK IS A CHRISTIAN FAITH-BASED CHARITY, BEING ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITY TO THOSE LIVING IN POVERTY IN THE DOMINICAN REPUBLIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, MAINLY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING: • MEDICAL FACILITIES TO TREAT AND PREVENT SICKNESS • HEALTH EDUCATION, ADVICE AND INFORMATION • A SCHOOL AND TEACHER SPONSORSHIP, TRANSPORT TO SECONDARY SCHOOL. • ADULT JOB SKILL TRAINING • ENGLISH LANGUAGE CLASSES - TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND RECREATION. - TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF DISABILITIES, SPECIFICALLY IN NAZARETH HOUSE CHILDREN’S HOME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Middlelodge Farm
Middle Lodge
CHIPPENHAM
SN15 3QX
- Phone:
- +1 8497206376
- Email:
- hopedominican@gmail.com
- Website:
-
WWW.GOMADTODAY.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window