SHEERNESS EAST YOUTH FOOTBALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an every day developing Youth football Club. With youngest being 4 years old in our development Colts teams. We Also have a further 11 teams ranging in age and abilities. Our philosophy is we never turn anyone away. We fund raise through the year for a variety of reasons including kits, equipment and currently the refurbishment of our changing rooms. We are proud to be a grass roots club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 30 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA SMITH | Chair | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
AARON JOHN FRENCH | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MATT RYAN | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.23k | £25.19k | £43.32k | £41.89k | £45.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.71k | £22.01k | £44.76k | £45.83k | £45.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.72k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.09k | £3.42k | £9.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2024
(These accounts |
08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
18 July 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY YOUTH PARTICIPATION FOR AGES 2 TO 16 IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF SWALE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING YOUTH FOOTBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sheerness East Working Mens Club
47 Queenborough Road
Minster On Sea
SHEERNESS
Kent
ME12 3BZ
- Phone:
- 07780900306
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window