WELLBEING AT GARON PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wellbeing activities for the local community and residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £19,272 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 19 June 2018: CIO registration
- WELLBEING@GARONPARK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Anne Garroway | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aron Priest | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John James Burrage | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jane Wyatt | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE RICHARD SHIRET | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR ALAN MARGERISON | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.02k | £85.37k | £242.55k | £73.36k | £35.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.36k | £18.30k | £279.30k | £165.89k | £48.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.32k | £7.62k | N/A | £2.00k | £19.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE BODIES WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND ON SEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING SECURE AND PRIVATE FACILITIES: A) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SENSORY HEALTH OF THE RESIDENTS; AND/OR B) FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THOSE RESIDENTS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR HEALTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRICKET PAVILION
GARON PARK
SOUTHEND ON SEA
ESSEX
SS2 4FA
SS2 4FA
- Phone:
- 07946855295
- Email:
- wellbeing@garonpark.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window