THE GUY FOUNDATION FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1178782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Guy Foundation facilitates the exploration of quantum effects in biology, with the ultimate goal of using this understanding to advance healthcare. Established in 2018, the Foundation funds scientific research and supports the quantum biology community by convening scientific symposia and hosting a global network of scientists and institutions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £277,208
Total expenditure: £846,132

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • South Africa
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • GUY FOUNDATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr GEOFFREY GUY Chair 11 January 2018
None on record
Lord William Waldegrave of North Hill PC Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Eric John Dixon Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
RICHARD BRASS Trustee 01 October 2018
MONTPELIER FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
JONATHAN LAUGHTON Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record
KATHERINE GUY Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.18k £5.03k £5.01k £505.73k £277.21k
Total expenditure £634.27k £659.39k £441.34k £178.39k £846.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £505.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £728 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £178.39k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £48.02k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £8.44k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 09 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Estate Office
Chedington Court
Chedington
BEAMINSTER
DT8 3HY
Phone:
01516003341
Email:
No information available