NIKKI'S WISHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of the mental health of children who have suffered from the bereavement of a parent or sibling by providing and assisting in the provision of days out and activities for recreation in the interests of social welfare and such other support designed to protect mental health and wellbeing as the trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL CROSS | Chair | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW GRIFFIN | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE JACKSON | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE BARNES | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.63k | £26.31k | £12.12k | £2.80k | £2.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.82k | £15.40k | £3.32k | £856 | £835 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: PRIMARILY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE BOROUGH OF DACORUM IN HERTFORDSHIRE, ENGLAND THAT INCLUDES THE TOWNS OF HEMEL HEMPSTEAD, BERKHAMSTED, TRING AND THE WESTERN PART OF KINGS LANGLEY: THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM THE BEREAVEMENT OF A PARENT OR SIBLING BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF DAYS OUT AND ACTIVITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT DESIGNED TO PROTECT MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 BEAUMAYES CLOSE
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 1SW
- Phone:
- 07821676729
- Email:
- nikkiswishes@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window