CROUCH END & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CEDU3A provides monthly meetings with a speaker, social events and around 70 different subject groups for those who are retired or semi-retired to attend. The charity is a self-help organisation and all activities are lead by volunteers, with members bringing together subject groups which others are interested in attending in their own homes or other local venues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 30 April 2018: Standard registration
- CROUCH END & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Luisa Welch | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phillip John Benns | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Arthur Wyndham Sich | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John David Harvey Weatherby | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Miller | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Midwinter | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Diane Holland | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Howard Morris | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Spungin | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dearman | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Hemingway | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Henry Sharp | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.69k | £22.37k | £13.99k | £23.77k | £32.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.46k | £10.28k | £16.96k | £26.83k | £28.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JAN 2018 as amended on 11 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULLTIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 81702
London
N4 9PS
- Phone:
- 07836204075
- Email:
- chair@cedu3a.org.uk
- Website:
-
cedu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window