HELP4DOGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help For Dogs operates within South Wales, although it will endeavour to help any dog rescue that contacts it, if it has the ability to do so. Help For Dogs also has links with Famagusta Animals Rehoming Canines in Cyprus, mainly helping with rehoming and fostering dogs to the UK. Donations of items distributed, and money raised to help further aid, for the benefit of helping dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cyprus
Governance
- 05 November 2018: CIO registration
- Help For Dogs (Working name)
- FAMAGUSTA ANIMAL REHOMING CANINES UK (Previous name)
- FARC UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
K WHELLER | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Hopkins | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer-Anne Browne | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Wilson | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE LEONARD TURNER | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.78k | £51.53k | £51.94k | £29.52k | £41.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.99k | £44.22k | £51.64k | £32.63k | £43.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND CYPRUS, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS, PROVIDE SUPPORT TO 'FAMAGUSTA ANIMAL REHOMING CANINES', CYPRUS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS IN CYPRUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Wyndcliffe View
St. Arvans
CHEPSTOW
Gwent
NP16 6ET
- Phone:
- 07786625119
- Email:
- admin@helpfordogs.co.uk
- Website:
-
HelpForDogs.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window