ASSOCIATION OF DOGS AND CATS HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association of Dogs and Cats Homes comprises dog and cat rescue and rehoming organisations across the British Isles. The Association works to promote best practice and high welfare and operational standards across the sector, engage effectively with a range of external stakeholders, including Governments, and bring rescue organisations together to share experiences, learning and networking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 November 2018: CIO registration
- ADCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Webb | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Goddard | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Peter Bray | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BOWLES | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Cantle | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Fielder | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola White | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Johnson | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marina Fiddler | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Elliott | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Clowes | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID HEPBURN | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILES EDWARD WEBBER | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.64k | £398.26k | £102.03k | £512.24k | £321.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.39k | £407.08k | £72.33k | £348.39k | £534.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £447.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.43k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £348.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.80k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 06 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 17 APR 2020 as amended on 19 May 2021 as amended on 28 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR RELATING TO DOGS AND CATS BY: (A) THE DEVELOPMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF GOOD PRACTICE IN ANIMAL WELFARE; (B) PROVIDING TRAINING, CONFERENCES AND RESOURCES ON SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE EFFICIENCY OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR; (C) PROVIDING VOLUNTARY LIAISON BETWEEN THE SECTOR, GOVERNMENT AGENCIES AND OTHER GROUPS ON ANIMAL WELFARE ISSUES. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 2. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE THROUGH GRANT AID, TO NON-PROFIT ORGANISATION’S AND REGISTERED CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANIMALS IN THEIR CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADCH
PO Box 76271
LONDON
SW8 9FA
- Phone:
- 07990004843
- Email:
- enquiries@adch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window