MARKAZ BUKHARI

Charity Number: 1181877
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Islamic religion for the benefit of the public through holding prayers, lectures, regular classes and producing and distributing literature on Islam to enlighten others about Islam

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £65,970
Total expenditure: £14,777

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abdikarim Mohamud Chair 05 February 2019
None on record
Abdi Fatah Musa Trustee 31 July 2024
None on record
Awil Abokor Trustee 05 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £62.57k £28.96k £23.33k £72.93k £65.97k
Total expenditure £10.40k £1.78k £3.36k £5.22k £14.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 11 February 2025 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 11 February 2025 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 29 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 27 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 Moss Grove
LIVERPOOL
L8 0SA
Phone:
07392949178