MALVERN UNIT 582 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give young people the best possible head start in life through nautical adventure and fun, based on the traditions and customs of the Royal Navy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 July 1981: Standard registration
- TS DUKE OF YORK (Working name)
- MALVERN SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hugh Black | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sub Lt Alleisha Jean Elizabeth Lewin RNR | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA ADAMS | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Captain Jonathan Holloway RN | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.26k | £30.75k | £28.61k | £28.75k | £44.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.60k | £15.24k | £24.49k | £19.22k | £48.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.27k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malvern Sea Cadet Corps
Spring Lane South
MALVERN
WR14 1AT
- Phone:
- 01684 565740
- Email:
- uaomalvern@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window