FRIENDS OF FAIRFORD AND LECHLADE COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Health and Social Care throughout Fairford, Lechlade and the Surrounding Villages. Our services include End of Life Home Nursing care, Patient Transport for medical related appointments and a weekly Lunch Club for the isolated and lonely. We provide funding to various local community groups. We have a Charity Shop based in Lechlade.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £14,369 from 2 government contract(s) and £916 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Harvey | Chair | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Christine Quinton | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
David Redbond | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Susan Margaret Clark | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Liesel Edith Sanford | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
ROBERT JOHN READ | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET PURSCH | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
RUTH HARTWELL BERRIDGE | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dr GRAHAM IAN WALLIS | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
ANDRENA MARGARET MILES | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.82k | £64.94k | £18.58k | £143.27k | £119.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.50k | £22.55k | £46.70k | £164.80k | £190.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.37k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.50k | £32.15k | £916 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2023 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2023 | 327 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH INCLUDING MENTAL HEALTH FOR ALL PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION AND/OR FUNDING OF MEDICAL AND HEALTHCARE SERVICES. C. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF PALLIATIVE CARE, RESPITE CARE, DAY CENTRES, MOBILITY ASSISTANCE, COUNSELLING AND END OF LIFE CARE. (2) THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS FAIRFORD, LECHLADE AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FFLC Charity Shop
Lloyds Chambers
High Street
LECHLADE
Gloucestershire
GL7 3AE
- Phone:
- 01285707300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window