Trustees CRICCIETH WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 511623

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Rosen | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Vincent | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Puw Parry | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Williams | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Campbell | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steffan Warren | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Catherine Rees | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE FISHER | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.