Trustees Sexual Trauma and Recovery Services - Dorset Rape Crisis
Charity number: 1178308

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Hancox | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jackie Farquharson | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Vagg | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Arabaci Hills | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cordner | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Alice Jane Cox Heeley BSc Hons | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.