ESSEX CANCER RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Widen access to cancer research; support local clinicians; promote collaboration between academia, industry and the NHS; use the expertise of the charity's Medical Advisory Board; improve availability and accessability of cancer information for patients and families through access to our own website which aims to provide the best prevailing inforation available. Engaging a community of supporters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Douglas Bruce | Chair | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Arthur Tuckwood | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Pauline O'Driscoll | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Krishnaswamy Madhavan | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Terence Cooper | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £35.74k | £35.27k | £18.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.23k | £18.76k | £35.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 October 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 October 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ESSEX BY:- 1.WIDENING THE ACCESS TO CANCER RESEARCH; 2.SUPPORTING LOCAL CLINICIANS TO INITIATE AND UNDERTAKE CANCER RESEARCH; 3.PROMOTING COLLABORATION BETWEEN ACADEMIA, INDUSTRY AND THE NHS TO CREATE A CANCER RESEARCH HUB; AND 4.IMPROVING AVAILABILITY AND ACCESSABILITY OF CANCER INFORMATION FOR PATIENTS AND FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Station Court
Station Approach
WICKFORD
Essex
SS11 7AT
- Phone:
- 07944623462
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window