SAVING LIVES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1178262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide free awareness sessions in CPR and defibrillators, to educate groups on he chain of survival, early recognition, early CPR and early defibrillation to help to increase the chance of survival of someone suffering an Out of Hospital Cardiac Arrest (OHCA). We show the practical skills of hands only CPR and using a defibrillator, and are able to dispel myths around this subject.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,847
Total expenditure: £19,921

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SALT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AISA FRASER Chair 01 January 2018
None on record
Amanda Nathalie Ashardi Trustee 09 May 2018
None on record
JACQUELINE PREDETH Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
ANGHARAD SARAH SNOW Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
ELEANOR BATCHELOR Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.47k £738 £100 £0 £19.85k
Total expenditure £3.27k £327 £609 £65 £19.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 September 2023 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 September 2023 308 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RC Snow & Son
Rothercombe Farm
Rothercombe Lane
PETERSFIELD
Hampshire
GU32 3PQ
Phone:
07967491656