GLOSSOPDALE FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is the relief of poverty of residents in the high peak and neighboring areas through actions including but not limited to, the provision of food parcels and information about other relevant services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Tameside
Governance
- 26 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GODFREY CLAFF | Chair | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ralls | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Oliver McLoughlin | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Graham Nigel Oakley | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Kimber | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET FOSTER | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
STELLA MARGARET HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE HOPLEY | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Carol Grills | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Bishop | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Hobson | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.11k | £149.78k | £115.90k | £126.58k | £139.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.62k | £89.85k | £105.15k | £118.72k | £159.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £390 | £2.55k | £2.55k | £1.00k | £1.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF RESIDENTS IN THE BOROUGH OF HIGH PEAK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS THROUGH ACTIONS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF FOOD PARCELS AND INFORMATION ABOUT OTHER RELEVANT SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bureau
Bank House
20-22 Henry Street
GLOSSOP
SK13 8BW
- Phone:
- 07811684282
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window