Accounts and annual returns MERRYFIELDS SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511636
Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1401 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1401 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days