SUNFLOWER SEED PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the education of children from families living/working within Northborough and surrounding area by providing childcare facilities for children aged 2-11; 2. To assist in developing children?s mental, physical and moral capabilities through leisure time activities for 2-11 yr olds through provision of pre?school, before and after school club, and holiday club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 13 April 2018: CIO registration
- 21 October 2020: Funds received from 1045625 SUNFLOWER SEED PRE-SCHOOL
- SUNFLOWER SEED PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lianne Desborough | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Kibble | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Judge | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chelsey Hughes | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Gelnar | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Geer | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Gatehouse | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.40k | £174.62k | £191.36k | £231.53k | £206.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.44k | £181.89k | £169.59k | £200.86k | £224.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £87.00k | £19.74k | £14.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN FROM FAMILIES LIVING OR WORKING WITHIN THE NORTHBOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CHILDCARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 TO 11; 2. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT BY DEVELOPING CHILDREN' MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 TO 11. 3. THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES TO BE ACHIEVED VIA PROVISION OF: PRE-SCHOOL FACILITIES BEFORE AND AFTER SCHOOL CLUB HOLIDAY CLUB
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNFLOWER SEED PRESCHOOL
CHURCH STREET
NORTHBOROUGH
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 9BN
- Phone:
- 01733253685
- Email:
- office@sunflower-seed.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window