BURROUGH GREEN PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide equality of opportunity and antidiscriminatory practice for all with the aim to provide a place within the setting for every child who wishes to attend, regardless of their financial background. The purpose being to offer all children the best possible start to their education, and, where necessary to provide additional support tailored to a childs individual needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 2018: CIO registration
- BURROUGH GREEN PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethany Higginbottom | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Richard William McDonnell | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL COLE | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Manuel Anson | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.54k | £60.80k | £65.31k | £84.67k | £66.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.58k | £52.54k | £60.25k | £72.29k | £74.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.99k | N/A | £50.67k | £69.93k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY; PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burrough Green Playgroup
Bradley Road
Burrough Green
NEWMARKET
Suffolk
CB8 9NH
- Phone:
- 01638506003
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window