KAOS YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a resource for young people living in the area of Rochford District Council and the surrounding areas, by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £16,695 from 15 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 28 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN PARSONS | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEANNE BARKER | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.19k | £28.59k | £48.84k | £43.12k | £49.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.36k | £25.61k | £44.00k | £45.64k | £47.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.70k | £2.10k | N/A | £22.64k | £16.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF ROCHFORD DISTRICT COUNCIL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 VICTORY LANE
ROCHFORD
SS4 3AN
- Phone:
- 07900330966
- Email:
- kaosyouthclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window