AGE CONCERN PETERSFIELD AND DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity covers Petersfield and the surrounding area. We provide a range of services to older people currently a twice weekly lunch club, a programme of outings, computer coaching, fitness and friendship groups and transport into town.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 June 2018: CIO registration
- 10 February 2020: Funds received from 232339 AGE CONCERN-PETERSFIELD AND DISTRICT
- AGE CONCERN-PETERSFIELD AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY BISHOP | Chair | 15 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Luc Blais | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Beverley Fyfe | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER RUSH | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £60.28k | £45.08k | £48.16k | £115.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.59k | £54.54k | £52.12k | £57.49k | £58.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINTON HOUSE CENTRE
WINTON HOUSE
18 HIGH STREET
PETERSFIELD
GU32 3JL
- Phone:
- 07852172998
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window